EP0364616 - A manually operated trigger type dispenser, a spinner for use in the dispenser, and a flow-pattern switching mechanism for use in the dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tada, Atsushi 2-6-3 Kakinokizaka Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117296.9 | 18.10.1988 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364616 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364616 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
B05B11/1004 (EP,US);
B05B11/1011 (EP,US);
B05B11/1095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/17] | Title | German: | Handbetätigbare Austragvorrichtung mit einem Auslösehebel, Drallvorrichtung und Vorrichtung zur Änderung des Strömungszustandes | [1990/17] | English: | A manually operated trigger type dispenser, a spinner for use in the dispenser, and a flow-pattern switching mechanism for use in the dispenser | [1990/17] | French: | Distributeur à gâchette actionné manuellement, dispositif pour agréer un tourbillon, mécanisme pour modifier le régime d'écoulement | [1990/17] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP63272675 ; | [A]EP0040850 (ETHYL PROD [US]); | [A]DE3340869 (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]US4538745 (DUNNING WALTER B [US], et al) | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 71 (M-799)[3419], 10th November 1988; & JP-A-63 272 675 (ATSUSHI TADA) 10-11-1988, & JP63272675 A 00000000 |