EP0318687 - Use of a variety of cast iron for brake bodies and brake discs comprising brake rings and a wave-shaped transition between brake ring and hub situated in the brake area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUDERUS GUSS GmbH Sophienstrasse 52-54 Postfach 1240 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | [1992/01] |
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states BUDERUS KUNDENGUSS GMBH Sophienstrasse 52-54 Postfach 1220 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keiner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Sachsenweg 1 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Schieschke, Klaus, et al Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Eder Dipl.-Ing. K. Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 D-80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117394.2 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | DE19873740912 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3740912 | [1989/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318687 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318687 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318687 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12, F16D69/02, C22C37/00 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
F16D65/123 (EP);
C22C37/00 (EP);
F16D65/125 (EP);
F16D65/128 (EP);
F16D69/027 (EP);
F16D2065/1316 (EP);
F16D2065/132 (EP);
F16D2065/1328 (EP);
F16D2065/1344 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Gusseisensorte für Bremsenkörper sowie Bremsscheiben mit Bremsringen und einem in der Bremsebene liegenden wellenförmigen Übergang zwischen Bremsring und Topf | [1989/23] | English: | Use of a variety of cast iron for brake bodies and brake discs comprising brake rings and a wave-shaped transition between brake ring and hub situated in the brake area | [1989/23] | French: | Utilisation d'un type de fonte pour corps de frein ainsi que pour disques de frein à anneaux de frein et comportant, située dans le plan du frein, une partie ondulée entre anneau de frein et pot | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1916272 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [A]FR1545169 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE); | [AD]DE3305184 (BUDERUS AG [DE]); | [A]DE8613662U ; | [A]DE2942151 (SCHMETZ INDUSTRIEOFENBAU UND V [DE]); | [A]GB2033509 (FORD MOTOR CO); | [A]GB542762 (BUDD WHEEL CO); | [A]US3084768 (GOODE ROBERT W); | [A]US3623579 (HENDRICKSON PAUL G, et al); | [A]DE3636120 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0074624 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [AD]DE2358140 (BUDERUS EISENWERK); | [AD]DE2539361 (BUDERUS EISENWERK); | [AP]EP0281765 (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKE GMBH [DE]); | [AP]DE8717318U |