EP0318688 - Limited-slip differential control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobari, Yuji 2-14-7, Shinjuku Zushi City / JP | 02 /
Imaseki, Takashi No. 7-11-12, Zushi Zushi City / JP | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/23] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117409.8 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | JP19870264525 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26452587 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318688 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318688 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/04, B62D7/14, F16H1/445 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
B60K23/04 (EP,US);
B62D9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/26] |
Former [1989/23] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Steuerung für Schlupfbegrenzung eines Ausgleichsgetriebes | [1989/23] | English: | Limited-slip differential control system | [1989/23] | French: | Système de commande pour transmission différentielle de type à glissement limité | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4633735 (SAKURAI MASAO [JP], et al); | [A]FR2434969 (BARDOT MICHEL); | [AP]EP0247820 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4679463 (OZAKI KIYOTAKA [JP], et al); | [AP]FR2609137 (RENAULT [FR]) | Examination | EP0310094 |