EP0313060 - Inverse flow depth filter assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states READING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Route 422 West Box 30 Reading, PA 19608 / US | [1989/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keith, Daniels R.D. no 1, Box 394D Birdsboro, PA 19508 / US | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1989/17] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Neckarstrasse 50 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117530.1 | 21.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | US19870112256 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: US 112256 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313060 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313060 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313060 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/10, B01D53/26, B01D46/24 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D47/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/17] | B01D46/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Tiefenfilter mit Umkehrströmung | [1989/17] | English: | Inverse flow depth filter assembly | [1989/17] | French: | Assemblage filtrant à contre-courant | [1993/11] |
Former [1989/17] | Assemblage de filtre en profondeur de contre-courant | Examination procedure | 07.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.1993 | BE | 29.12.1993 | CH | 29.12.1993 | GR | 29.12.1993 | LI | 29.12.1993 | NL | 29.12.1993 | SE | 29.12.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/08] | AT | 29.12.1993 | |
BE | 29.12.1993 | ||
CH | 29.12.1993 | ||
LI | 29.12.1993 | ||
NL | 29.12.1993 | ||
SE | 29.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | AT | 29.12.1993 | |
BE | 29.12.1993 | ||
CH | 29.12.1993 | ||
LI | 29.12.1993 | ||
SE | 29.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 29.12.1993 | |
CH | 29.12.1993 | ||
LI | 29.12.1993 | ||
SE | 29.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/43] | CH | 29.12.1993 | |
LI | 29.12.1993 | ||
SE | 29.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 29.12.1993 | |
LI | 29.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1531096 (HOFFMAN LEON F); | [A]US2058189 (STUARD JAMES A); | [A]US2402140 (HEINTZELMAN LEO A); | [A]US3415041 (KRAISSL JR FREDERICK); | [A]DE1912937 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG); | [AD]US3791105 (RHODES H); | [A]DE3017851 (ORION MACHINERY CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4600416 (MANN DAVID O [US]) |