EP0313065 - Mineral surfacing and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHROMOROC 17, Rue du Port B.P.43 F-27400 Louviers / FR | [1989/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheiwiller, Jurg 76, Rue du Général de Gaulle F-27100 Le Vaudreuil / FR | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/17] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-8000 Munich 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117564.0 | 21.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | FR19870014618 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: FR 8714618 | [1989/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313065 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E01C7/30, E04F15/12, C04B40/00 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
C04B40/0028 (EP);
E01C7/30 (EP);
E04F15/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Mineralischer Belag und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1989/17] | English: | Mineral surfacing and its manufacturing process | [1989/17] | French: | Revêtement minéral et procédé pour le préparer | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]BE899599 ; | [YD]FR2208860 ; | [A]DE1509879 ; | [AD]DE2306360 ; | [A]US4017449 |