EP0315001 - Electrolytic decontamination apparatus and encapsulation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snyder, Thomas Stephen 530 Tenth Street Oakmont Pennsylvania 15139 / US | 02 /
Murray, Alexander P. 3943 Hickory Hill Road Murrysville Pennsylvania 15668 / US | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Stratmann, Ernst Strücker Weg 14 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Stratmann, Ernst, Dr.-Ing. Schadowplatz 9 D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117633.3 | 22.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870116088 | 03.11.1987 Original published format: US 116088 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315001 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315001 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/00, G21F9/14 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
C25F7/02 (EP,US);
G21F9/00 (KR);
G21F9/002 (EP,US);
G21F9/06 (EP,US);
G21F9/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur elektrolytischen Dekontamination und Verfahren zur Einbettung | [1989/19] | English: | Electrolytic decontamination apparatus and encapsulation process | [1989/19] | French: | Appareil de décontamination électrolytique et procédé d'encapsulage | [1992/38] |
Former [1989/19] | Appareil de décontamination électrolytique et procédé d'encapsulation | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2513427 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [A]DE2720422 (HENNING BERLIN GMBH); | [X]EP0075882 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [YD]US4537666 (MURRAY ALEXANDER P [US], et al); | [A]EP0162356 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) |