blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0315052

EP0315052 - Cross-flow heat-exchanger made of plastic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.06.1990
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.1990Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.08.1990 [1990/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Röhm GmbH
Kirschenallee
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
[1989/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Emmerich, Friedel
Weinbergstrasse 29a
D-6104 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE
02 / Franitza, Dieter
Karlsbader Strasse 10
D-6100 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Hartmann, Heinrich
In der Aue 17a
D-6101 Reichelsheim / DE
04 / Kerk, Klaus
Bessunger Strasse 10a
D-6103 Griesheim / DE
[1989/19]
Application number, filing date88117901.427.10.1988
[1989/19]
Priority number, dateDE19870014559U02.11.1987         Original published format: DE 8714559 U
[1989/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0315052
Date:10.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1989
ClassificationIPC:F28D9/02, F28F3/12
[1989/19]
CPC:
F28D9/0062 (EP,US); B27N5/02 (EP); F28F21/065 (EP,US);
Y10S165/384 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/19]
TitleGerman:Kreuzstromwärmetauscher aus Kunststoff[1989/19]
English:Cross-flow heat-exchanger made of plastic[1989/19]
French:Echangeur de chaleur à courants croisés fait de plastique[1989/19]
File destroyed:01.07.1996
Examination procedure03.08.1989Examination requested  [1989/39]
04.08.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
27.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.1989Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.01.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1990Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1990/32]
16.03.1990Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/32]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0044561  (MUANYAGIPARI KUTATO INTEZET [HU]);
 [Y]US3274672  (FRANKLYN DORE);
 [A]FR2318398  (MUNTERS AB CARL [SE]);
 [A]US1409967  (EMILE PRAT);
 [AD]DE3137296  (SCHULZE BERGE OTTO, et al);
 [A]FR2449261  (HOVAL INTERLIZ AG [LI]);
 [A]US2959401  (BURTON JAMES C)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.