EP0315086 - Rubber modified vinyl ester resins from polyglycidyl ethers of adducts of a phenol with an unsaturated hydrocarbon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Change - applicant | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Mary N. 108 Aster Lane Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
Puckett, Paul M. 126 Daisy Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | 03 /
Blankenship. Larry T. 318 Carnation Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118045.9 | 29.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870116926 | 03.11.1987 Original published format: US 116926 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315086 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315086 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/10, C08G59/17 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
B32B27/04 (EP);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B15/09 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
C08F299/026 (EP);
C08G59/066 (EP);
C08G59/1461 (EP);
C08L63/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/10, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L63/10, C08L2666/22 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Kautschukmodifizierte Vinylesterharze auf der Basis von Polyglycidyläthern von Addukten von Phenol mit einer ungesättigten Kohlenwasserstoffverbindung | [1989/19] | English: | Rubber modified vinyl ester resins from polyglycidyl ethers of adducts of a phenol with an unsaturated hydrocarbon | [1989/19] | French: | Résines d'esters vinyliques modifiées par du caoutchouc à partir d'éthers polyglycidyliques d'adducts de phénol avec un composé insaturé d'hydrocarbure | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 02.09.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2025004 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [AD]US3892819 (NAJVAR DANIEL J); | [Y]EP0055477 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]DE3512791 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP], et al) |