EP0315097 - Acyl labdane derivatives, process for their preparation and their use as medicines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khandelwal, Yatendra, Dr. M-8, Hoechst Executive Quarters Darga Road Mulund (West) Bombay 400 082 / IN | 02 /
Kannan, Rajeshwari 101, Abhinnandan Sarvodaya Parshwanath Nagar Nahur Mulund (West) Bombay 400 080 / IN | 03 /
Lal, Bansi, Dr. 30 Advani Apartments Mulund (West) Bombay 400 080 / IN | 04 /
Dohadwalla, Alihussein Nomanbhai, Dr. Noman Mansion, 139 C Cumball Hill Bombay 400 036 / IN | 05 /
Rajgopalan, Ramanujam, Dr. 203, B Wing Arthi Sarojini Naidu Road Mulund (West) Bombay 400 080 / IN | 06 /
Rupp, Richard Helmut, Dr. Roederweg 16a D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [1989/19] | Application number, filing date | 88118073.1 | 29.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | DE19873737353 | 04.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3737353 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315097 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315097 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/92, C07F7/18, A61K31/695 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
C07D311/92 (EP);
C07D405/12 (KR);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Neue Acyllabdan-Derivate, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | [1989/19] | English: | Acyl labdane derivatives, process for their preparation and their use as medicines | [1989/19] | French: | Dérivés d'acyl-labdane, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme médicament | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0193132 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]); | [X]EP0222413 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | [X]GB1594115 (HOECHST AG); | [XP]EP0252482 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [XP]WO8805047 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]); | [E]EP0294695 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [E]EP0297496 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 107, Nr. 17, 26. Oktober 1987, Seite 322, Zusammenfassung Nr. 150100z, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. LAURENZA et al.: "Stimulation of adenylate cyclase by water-soluble analogs of forskolin", & MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY 1987, 32(1), 133-139 |