EP0315102 - Device for superposing pieces of strip material, particularly pieces of photographic film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSTEL INTERNATIONAL S.p.A. Galleria del Corso, 4 Milano / IT | [1990/18] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states Photo Engineering International S.r.l. Via Dosa, 1a 30030 Olmo di Martellago (Venezia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Signoretto, Roberto Via Dosa, 1 I-30030 - Olmo di Martellago (Venezia) / IT | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Piovesana, Paolo c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A.- Venezia Via Francesco Baracca, 5/A 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Piovesana, Paolo Corso del Popolo, 70 I-30172 Venezia-Mestre / IT | Application number, filing date | 88118118.4 | 31.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | IT19870084170 | 06.11.1987 Original published format: IT 8417087 | [1989/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315102 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315102 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315102 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03D15/00 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
G03D15/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufeinanderlegen von Streifenmaterial insbesondere Filmstreifen | [1989/19] | English: | Device for superposing pieces of strip material, particularly pieces of photographic film | [1989/19] | French: | Dispositif de superposition de matériel en bande, en particulier de film photographique | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.09.1994
05.10.1994
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert AG Patentabteilung LG Postfach D-51301 Leverkusen / DE | [1994/46] | 21.11.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.05.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 08.10.1995 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.1994 | BE | 12.01.1994 | CH | 12.01.1994 | ES | 12.01.1994 | GR | 12.01.1994 | IT | 12.01.1994 | LI | 12.01.1994 | NL | 12.01.1994 | SE | 12.01.1994 | LU | 31.10.1994 | [2007/52] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 12.01.1994 | |
BE | 12.01.1994 | ||
CH | 12.01.1994 | ||
ES | 12.01.1994 | ||
GR | 12.01.1994 | ||
IT | 12.01.1994 | ||
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
NL | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
LU | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 12.01.1994 | |
BE | 12.01.1994 | ||
CH | 12.01.1994 | ||
GR | 12.01.1994 | ||
IT | 12.01.1994 | ||
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
NL | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
LU | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.01.1994 | |
BE | 12.01.1994 | ||
CH | 12.01.1994 | ||
IT | 12.01.1994 | ||
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
NL | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | AT | 12.01.1994 | |
BE | 12.01.1994 | ||
CH | 12.01.1994 | ||
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
NL | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | AT | 12.01.1994 | |
BE | 12.01.1994 | ||
CH | 12.01.1994 | ||
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 12.01.1994 | |
CH | 12.01.1994 | ||
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/44] | CH | 12.01.1994 | |
LI | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 12.01.1994 | |
LI | 12.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4026421 (LOTZ WALTER EDWARD); | [A]DE2758979 (AGFA GEVAERT AG); | [A]US4290594 (LUEDEMANN HEINZ, et al) | by applicant | US4290594 |