EP0320608 - Spring for a damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOCO Franz-Josef Wolf & Co. Sprudelallee 19 63628 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states WOCO Franz-Josef Wolf & Co. Sprudelallee 19 D-63628 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Franz Josef Sprudelallee 19 D-6483 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | 02 /
Pletsch, Hubert Am Quellenrain 13 D-6483 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Jaeger, Klaus, et al propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Auguste-Viktoria-Allee 87 13403 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dr., et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Postfach 16 20 D-82121 Gauting / DE | ||
Former [1989/25] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Jaeger, Böck & Köster Patentanwälte Postfach 1620 D-82121 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118129.1 | 31.10.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | DE19873741731 | 09.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741731 | [1989/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320608 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320608 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320608 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/36, F16F9/49 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
F16F1/377 (EP);
F16F9/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1989/25] | Title | German: | Stossdämpferfeder | [1989/25] | English: | Spring for a damper | [1989/25] | French: | Ressort pour amortisseur | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 18.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Request for further processing for: | 29.10.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.08.1994 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61124740 ; | [Y]FR2537061 (GOMMA ANTIVIBRANTI APPLIC [IT]); | [Y]DE3101165 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2188736 (KLEBER COLOMBES [FR]); | [A]FR2539836 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]EP0187888 (WOLF WOCO & CO FRANZ J [DE]); | [A]EP0092066 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 315 (M-529)[2371], 25. Oktober 1986; & JP-A-61 124 740 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND. CO. LTD) 12-06-1986, & JP61124740 A 00000000 |