EP0314192 - Friction element engagement pressure and timing control arrangement for automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1989/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugano, Kazuhiko No. 884-1-1022, Kamikurata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/18] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118152.3 | 31.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | JP19870273217 | 30.10.1987 Original published format: JP 27321787 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0314192 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0314192 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314192 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/08 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
F16H61/065 (EP,US);
F16H2061/044 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0466 (EP,US);
F16H61/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | F16H5/78, F16H5/64 | ||
Former IPC [1989/18] | F16H5/78 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/18] | Title | German: | Reibelementanpressdruck- und -Zeit-Steuerung für ein Automatikgetriebe | [1989/18] | English: | Friction element engagement pressure and timing control arrangement for automatic transmission | [1989/18] | French: | Arrangement de commande de pression et de durée pour l'enclenchement d'élément friction d'une transmission automatique | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55149454 ; | [AP]US4730521 (HAYASAKI KOICHI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 22 (M-54)(694) 10 February 1981, & JP-A-55 149454 (AISHIN WARNER) 20 November 1980,, & JP55149454 A 19801120 | Examination | EP0214467 |