EP0315119 - Method and apparatus for high resolution liquid toner electrostatic transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY Barley Plaza, Building 17, P.O. Box 80017 Wilmington, DE 19880-0017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanchet-Fincher, Graciela Beatriz 2005 Fairwood Lane Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | 02 /
Benack, Kerin Sue Apt. 2004N 5020 S. Lake Shore Drive Chicago Illinois 60615 / US | 03 /
Taggi, Arthur John 701 Partridge Court Hockessin Delaware 19707 / US | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118173.9 | 01.11.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870117269 | 04.11.1987 Original published format: US 117269 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315119 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315119 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315119 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
G03G15/1635 (EP,US);
G03G13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum elektrostatischen Übertragen von Flüssigtonern für hohe Auflösung | [1989/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for high resolution liquid toner electrostatic transfer | [1989/19] | French: | Méthode et appareil de transfert électrostatique à haute résolution pour toner liquide | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.1993 | BE | 04.08.1993 | CH | 04.08.1993 | FR | 04.08.1993 | IT | 04.08.1993 | LI | 04.08.1993 | SE | 04.08.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
BE | 04.08.1993 | ||
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
IT | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
FR | 24.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
BE | 04.08.1993 | ||
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
FR | 24.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
FR | 24.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | CH | 04.08.1993 | |
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/05] | CH | 04.08.1993 | |
LI | 04.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3893760 (THETTU RAGHULINGA R); | [A]GB2022513 (AUSTRALIA RES LAB); | [A]US4190348 (FRIDAY BRUCE W [US]); | [AD]US4256820 (LANDA BENZION); | [A]GB2095621 (SAVIN CORP) |