blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0315878

EP0315878 - Internal gear pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.1993
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.1993 [1993/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BARMAG AG
Leverkuser Strasse 65 Postfach 11 02 40
D-42862 Remscheid / DE
[1989/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Hertell, Siegfried
Am Kattenbusch 22 a
D-5608 Radevormwald / DE
02 / Otto, Dieter
Hollberg 108
D-5828 Ennepetal / DE
[1989/20]
Representative(s)Pfingsten, Dieter
Barmag AG
Postfach 11 02 40
D-42862 Remscheid / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/20]Pfingsten, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Barmag AG, Postfach 11 02 40
D-42862 Remscheid / DE
Application number, filing date88118185.302.11.1988
[1989/20]
Priority number, dateDE1987373796107.11.1987         Original published format: DE 3737961
DE1987374315319.12.1987         Original published format: DE 3743153
[1989/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0315878
Date:17.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0315878
Date:17.01.1990
Language:DE
[1990/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0315878
Date:01.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1989
ClassificationIPC:F04C2/10
[1989/20]
CPC:
F04C15/068 (EP); F04C2/088 (EP); F04C2/102 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1989/20]
TitleGerman:Innenzahnradpumpe[1989/20]
English:Internal gear pump[1989/20]
French:Pompe à engrènement interne[1989/20]
Examination procedure29.04.1989Examination requested  [1989/27]
12.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.1991Fee for grant paid
16.11.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE3444859  ;
 [A]DE3444857  ;
 [Y]FR2196678  ;
 [A]US4145167  ;
 [A]US2428181  ;
 [A]US3490383  ;
 [A]US4025243  ;
 [A]US2830542
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.