EP0315188 - Methods and materials for the preparation of metal labelled antibody solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, David K. 16 Parkside Court Vernon Hills Illinois 60061 / US | 02 /
Rogers, Patrick E. 17542 West Hickory Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/19] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118414.7 | 04.11.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870118148 | 06.11.1987 Original published format: US 118148 | US19880261737 | 26.10.1988 Original published format: US 261737 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315188 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315188 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315188 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/02, A61K43/00 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
A61K51/1093 (EP);
A61K39/44 (KR);
A61K2121/00 (EP);
A61K2123/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Materialien zur Herstellung der Lösungen von metallmarkierten Antikörpern | [1989/19] | English: | Methods and materials for the preparation of metal labelled antibody solutions | [1989/19] | French: | Méthode et matériaux de préparation de solutions d'anticorps marqués avec des métaux | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.1995
11.04.1995
ADMISSIBLE The Wellcome Foundation Limited Langley Court Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB Opponent's representative Baker-Munton, Nicola Jane Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.1995
11.04.1995
ADMISSIBLE The Wellcome Foundation Limited Langley Court Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB Opponent's representative Baker-Munton, Nicola Jane The Wellcome Foundation Limited Group Patents & Agreements Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | 13.04.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.11.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.04.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.1997 | GB | 04.11.1997 | [1998/41] |
Former [1998/40] | AT | 04.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2527928 (GANSOW OTTO [US]); | [YD]EP0174853 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]); | [Y]US4636380 (WONG DENNIS W [US]) | [YD] - THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 28, no. 5, May 1987, pages 861-870; J.M. ESTEBAN et al.: "New method for the chelation of indium-111 to monoclonal antibodies: Biodistribution and imaging of athymic mice bearing human colon carcinoma xenografts" | [YD] - THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICNE, vol. 26, no. 5, May 1985, pages 493-502; D.A. GOODWIN et al.: "Chelate conjugates of monoclonal antibodies for imaging lymphoid structures in the mouse" | [AD] - CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 45, November 1985, pages 5694-5699; R.J. PAXTON et al.: "High-specific-activity 111in-labeled anticarcinoembryonic antigen monclonal antibody: Improved method for the synthesis of diethylenetriaminepentaacetic acid conjugates" | [AD] - INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 25, 1986, pages 2772-2781, American Chemical Society, US; M.W. BRECHBIEL et al.: "Synthesis of 1-(p-isothiocyanatobenzyl) derivatives of DTPA and EDTA. Antibody labeling and tumor-imaging studies" | Examination | - Abdel-Nabi, H.H. et al, Radiology, pages 617-621 sept 1987 |