EP0318724 - Process for chemically stripping a high chromic surface coating from a work piece made from a nickel or cobalt based superalloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sova, Vladimir Schürmattstrasse 17 CH-5453 Remetschwil / CH | [1989/23] | Application number, filing date | 88118502.9 | 07.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | CH19870004675 | 01.12.1987 Original published format: CH 467587 | [1989/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318724 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318724 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/44 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
C23F1/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum chemischen Ablösen einer hochchromhaltigen Oberflächenschutzschicht vom Grundkörper eines aus einer Nickel- oder Kobaltbasis-Superlegierung bestehenden Bauteils | [1989/23] | English: | Process for chemically stripping a high chromic surface coating from a work piece made from a nickel or cobalt based superalloy | [1989/23] | French: | Procédé pour enlever par voie chimique des revêtements de surface protecteurs à base de chrome à partir de pièces en superalliages à base de nickel ou de cobalt | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3562040 (GARIES GERALD A); | [A]FR2233418 (OXY METAL INDUSTRIES CORP [US]); | [A]FR2349663 (ROLLS ROYCE [GB], et al); | [AD]US4339282 (LADA HENRY, et al) | [A] - SURFACE TREATMENT TECHNOLOGY ABSTRACTS, Band 29, Nr. 2, März/April 1987, Seite 74, 2. "Pickling and descaling", linke Spalte, C, Teddington, Middlesex, GB; O.A. NAZAROV et al.: "Etchant composition for nickel coatings on cast iron hardened by various methods of chemical thermal traetment", & VNII REZINO-TEKHN MASHINOSTR. TAMBOV, 1985 |