EP0367842 - Handle assembly for doors, windows or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. HAUTAU GMBH Bahnhofstrasse 29 Postfach 1151 D-31689 Helpsen / DE | [1990/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lahmann, Ernst Dorfstrasse 32 D-3061 Meerbeck / DE | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim, et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr., et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118504.5 | 07.11.1988 | [1990/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367842 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367842 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/02 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
E05C9/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/20] | Title | German: | Handhebelgetriebe zum Aufschrauben auf den Flügelrahmen von Fenstern, Türen oder dergleichen | [1990/20] | English: | Handle assembly for doors, windows or the like | [1990/20] | French: | Poignée crémone pour portes, fenêtres ou similaires | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1988 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 01.12.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE508456 ; | [Y]FR2560271 ; | [Y]FR2568302 ; | [Y]DE1085066 |