EP0315939 - Color signature sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sullivan, Charles T. 11912 Baypoint Drive Burnsville Minnesota 55337 / US | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Rentzsch, Heinz, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [1989/20] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Kaiserleistrasse 39 Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118545.8 | 08.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | US19870118585 | 09.11.1987 Original published format: US 118585 | [1989/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315939 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315939 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/46, B07C3/14 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (EP,US);
G01J3/50 (EP,US);
G01J3/502 (EP,US);
G01J2003/466 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/20] | Title | German: | Fühler für Farbkennzeichnung | [1989/20] | English: | Color signature sensor | [1989/20] | French: | Senseur de signature de couleur | [1989/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/19] | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58103071 ; | [Y]US3737239 (ADAMS J, et al); | [Y]US4449821 (LEE JERALD D [US]); | [A]US3942154 (AKAMI HITOSHI, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 210 (P-233)[1355], 16th September 1983; & JP 58103071 A (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) 18-06-1983, & JP58103071 A 00000000 |