Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0315939 | Global Dossier | 29.08.1990 | A3 | EP0315939 | 17.05.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11858587 | 09.11.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1305879 | 04.08.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | US11858587 | 09.11.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4954972 | 04.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US11858587 | 09.11.1987 |