Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0316789
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.05.1993 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] |
02.03.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] |
18.02.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] |
05.06.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] |
30.07.1991 |
First examination report |
|
07.05.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] |
20.02.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] |
08.04.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] |