EP0316789 - Adjustable power transmission element using inertia-sensitive blocking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.A. Rentrop, Hubbert & Wagner Fahrzeugausstattungen GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1264 31653 Stadthagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states P.A. Rentrop, Hubbert & Wagner Fahrzeugausstattungen GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1264 D-31653 Stadthagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ernst, Hans-Hellmut Bismarckallee 50 D-2070 Ahrensburg / DE | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Thielking, Bodo, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Thielking, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118794.2 | 11.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | DE19873738797 | 14.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738797 | [1989/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316789 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316789 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316789 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/00, B60N2/06 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
B60N2/43 (EP,US);
B60N2/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/929 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/21] | B60N1/00, B60N1/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Verstellbares Kraftübertragungselement mit trägheitssensitiver Blockierung | [1989/21] | English: | Adjustable power transmission element using inertia-sensitive blocking | [1989/21] | French: | Elément réglable de transmission de force avec blocage sensitif à l'inertie | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.07.1992 | NL | 22.07.1992 | [1993/16] |
Former [1993/14] | NL | 22.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0242859 (ERNST HANS HELLMUT); | [A]US3828893 (CLARK T); | [AP]EP0245650 (ERNST HANS HELLMUT) |