EP0317847 - Apparatus and method for blood chemistry analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPACELABS, INC. 4200- 150th Avenue N.E. Redmond Washington 98073-9713 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states SPACELABS, INC. 4200- 150th Avenue N.E. Redmond Washington 98073-9713 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelikan, Glenn W. 2836 N.E. 54th Portland Oregon 97213 / US | 02 /
Lombardi, Carl A. 13305 N. E. 51st Place Bellevue Washington 98005 / US | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/22] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118824.7 | 11.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | US19870121673 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: US 121673 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317847 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14, G01N33/48 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/14546 (EP);
A61B5/15003 (EP);
A61B5/150389 (EP);
A61B5/150519 (EP);
A61B5/153 (EP);
A61B5/157 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur chemischen Blutanalyse | [1989/22] | English: | Apparatus and method for blood chemistry analysis | [1989/22] | French: | Dispositif et procédé destinés à l'analyse chimique du sang | [1989/22] | File destroyed: | 01.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 22.03.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/42] | 21.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4553552 ; | [X]AT376117B ; | [X]DE2850546 ; | [A]WO8704914 ; | [A]DE2622959 |