EP0316839 - Listening comfort enhancer in the presence of carrier fading in an FM/PM narrow-band receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE 10, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE 10, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states ALCATEL THOMSON RADIOTELEPHONE 15, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genty, Gérard 24bis, Rue de la Gare F-78780 Maurécourt / FR | 02 /
Varin, Joel 67, Rue Robinet F-95520 Osny / FR | 03 /
Belicaud, Michel 14, Avenue de la Libération F-95130 Franconville / FR | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118946.8 | 14.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | FR19870016011 | 19.11.1987 Original published format: FR 8716011 | [1989/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0316839 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316839 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03G9/02, H03G3/20 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
H03G3/20 (EP);
H03G3/3068 (EP);
H03G9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Hörverbesserungsschaltung im Falle eines Trägerschwunds in einem schmalbandigen FM/PM-Empfänger | [1989/21] | English: | Listening comfort enhancer in the presence of carrier fading in an FM/PM narrow-band receiver | [1989/21] | French: | Dispositif d'amélioration du confort d'écoute en présence d'évanouissement de porteuse dans une chaîne de réception d'un équipement FM/PM à bande étroite, notamment en radiotéléphonie | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 25.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5254352 ; | [X]WO8706072 ; | [Y]US3605018 ; | [A]US4408098 | [Y] - ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 2, no. 4, août 1980, pages 215-218, Eindhoven, NL; D.J. VAN DER WAL: "Interference suppression for FM radios" | [A] - RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK, vol. 28, no. 12, décembre 1982, page 814, Berlin, DD; H.P. SEIFERT: "Automatische Störaustastung beim AM-Empfang" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 123, 17 octobre 1977, page 5059 E 77; & JP-A-52 54 352 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 02-05-1977, & JP5254352 A 00000000 |