EP0316897 - Apparatus for cutting asphalt pavings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAGELA BAUMASCHINEN GMBH & CO. Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 5 D-2358 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [1989/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marquardt, Dieter Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 5 D-2358 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Schupfner, Gerhard D. Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Schupfner, Gerhard D. Patentanwälte Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 17 53 D-21236 Buchholz / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119098.7 | 17.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | DE19873739294 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3739294 | [1989/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0316897 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/12 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
E01C23/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Durchtrennen von Asphaltdecken | [1989/21] | English: | Apparatus for cutting asphalt pavings | [1989/21] | French: | Dispositif pour découper les revêtements asphaltiques | [1989/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/31] | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2059449 ; | [AD]GB2100664 ; | [A]US4374602 ; | [A]DE1133745 ; | [A]GB344994 |