EP0320654 - Poltrusion apparatus and method for impregnating continuous lengths of multi-filament and multi-fiber structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilakos, William 6700 South Davis Road Mt. Vernon Indiana 47620 / US | 02 /
Patterson, Dwight Juan 7303 West Vernon Drive Evansville Indiana 47712 / US | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88119326.2 | 21.11.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | US19870133419 | 15.12.1987 Original published format: US 133419 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320654 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320654 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/14 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
C08G64/30 (EP,US);
B29C70/521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/25] | Title | German: | Pultrusionsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Imprägnieren eines kontinuierlichen Abschnittes einer Multifilament- oder Multifaserstruktur | [1989/25] | English: | Poltrusion apparatus and method for impregnating continuous lengths of multi-filament and multi-fiber structures | [1989/25] | French: | Appareil de pultrusion et procédé pour imprégner des mèches continues d'une structure multifilamentaire ou multifibreuse | [1989/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3546000 (MEDNEY JONAS); | [A]DE1629356 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR); | [A]US4194873 (KILLMEYER CHARLES W [US]); | [X]EP0056703 ; | [XP]US4714737 (PATTERSON DWIGHT J [US]) |