EP0317948 - Arc exposure monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Steel plc 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | [1989/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montgomery, Robert Walter 20 School Road Laughton-en-le Morthern Nr. Sheffield Sth. Yorks / GB | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Shipley, Henry Horton, et al British Steel plc Patents Section 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | [1995/42] |
Former [1989/22] | Broughton, Clifford David British Steel plc Patent Section 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88119401.3 | 22.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | GB19870027532 | 25.11.1987 Original published format: GB 8727532 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317948 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317948 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317948 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/144 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
H05B7/144 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Kontrolle des Aussetzungsgrades eines Lichtbogens | [1989/22] | English: | Arc exposure monitor | [1989/22] | French: | Contrôle de degré d'exposition d'un arc | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 24.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.1994
28.01.1994
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.1994
28.01.1994
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 03.06.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.09.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.08.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1993 | BE | 28.07.1993 | ES | 23.11.1994 | SE | 23.11.1994 | FR | 31.07.1995 | DE | 01.08.1995 | [2004/38] |
Former [1996/03] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
BE | 28.07.1993 | ||
SE | 23.11.1994 | ||
FR | 31.07.1995 | ||
DE | 01.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
BE | 28.07.1993 | ||
FR | 31.07.1995 | ||
DE | 01.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
BE | 28.07.1993 | ||
DE | 01.08.1995 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
BE | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2072181 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS VERWALTUNG); | [A]EP0066502 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]); | [X]DE3616344 (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]) | [X] - ELEKTROWARME INTERNATIONAL. vol. 45, no. 1, February 1987, ESSEN DE pages B29 - B36; K. Timm and R. Grigat: "Rechnergestützte Prozessbeobachtung des Schmelzvorganges im Lichtbogenofen" | [A] - Iron and Steel Engineer vol. 44, no. 12, December 1967, Pittsburgh, USA pages 97 - 100; C.F. Rebhun et al.: "Use of Arc Voltage Characteristics As a Control for Consumable Electrode Melting" |