EP0318808 - Process for reducing emissions of sulfur oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/23] | Process for reducing emissions of sulfur oxides and composition useful in same | ||
[1996/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.1997 [1997/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states KATALISTIKS INTERNATIONAL, Inc. 1501 Sulgrave Avenue Baltimore Maryland 21209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhattacharyya, Alak A. 9240 Houglass Place Columbia Maryland 21045 / US | 02 /
Karch, John A. 2520 Thompson Drive Marriottsville Maryland 21140 / US | 03 /
Yoo, Jin S. 2315 Mast Court Flossmoor Illinois 60422 / US | 04 /
Radlowski, Cecelia A. 401 Herrick Road Riverside Illinois 60546 / US | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, et al Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr., et al Räderscheidtstrasse 1 D-50935 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119436.9 | 23.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | US19870124618 | 24.11.1987 Original published format: US 124618 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318808 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318808 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318808 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/50, B01J23/00, C10G11/04, C10G11/05 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
C10G11/05 (EP,US);
B01D53/8609 (EP,US);
B01J23/00 (EP,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
C10G11/04 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/72 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/845 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/72 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1989/23] | B01D53/36, B01J23/00, C10G11/04, C10G11/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung des Schwefeloxid-Ausstosses | [1996/07] | English: | Process for reducing emissions of sulfur oxides | [1996/07] | French: | Procédé pour réduire les émissions d'oxydes de soufre | [1996/07] |
Former [1989/23] | Verfahren und Komposition zur Verminderung des Schwefeloxid-Ausstosses | ||
Former [1989/23] | Process for reducing emissions of sulfur oxides and composition useful in same | ||
Former [1989/23] | Procédé pour réduire les émissions d'oxydes de soufre et compositions utilisables dans ce procédé | Examination procedure | 18.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.12.1988 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 | 23.12.1988 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   20.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.1996 | BE | 14.02.1996 | SE | 14.05.1996 | [1996/52] |
Former [1996/42] | AT | 14.02.1996 | |
SE | 14.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3931393 (PALILLA FRANK C); | [AD]US4055513 (WHEELOCK KENNETH S); | [A]US4124697 (WHELAN JAMES M); | [A]US4134852 (VOLIN TIMOTHY E); | [A]US4208269 (GLADROW ELROY M [US], et al); | [A]EP0082915 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]EP0089199 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4472267 (YOO JIN S [US], et al); | [A]EP0205102 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0208220 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) |