EP0319794 - Polysilazanes, their preparation, and preparation of silicon nitride-containing ceramic articles. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/24] | Polysilazanes, their preparation, silicon nitride-containing ceramic articles and their preparation | ||
[1993/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaahs, Tilo, Dr. Am Flachsland 54 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Kleiner, Hans-Jerg, Dr. Altkönigstrasse 11a D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Peuckert, Marcellus, Dr. Platanenweg 8 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Brück, Martin Haneckstrassse 17 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | [1989/24] | Application number, filing date | 88119656.2 | 25.11.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | DE19873741059 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741059 | [1989/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319794 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319794 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319794 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/62, C04B35/00 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
C08G77/62 (EP,US);
C08G77/42 (KR);
C04B35/589 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/24] | Title | German: | Polysilazane, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Siliziumnitrid enthaltenden keramischen Materiallen. | [1993/35] | English: | Polysilazanes, their preparation, and preparation of silicon nitride-containing ceramic articles. | [1993/35] | French: | Polysilazanes, procédé pour leur préparation,et procédé pour la préparation de matériaux céramiques fabriqués à partir de nitrure de silice. | [1993/35] |
Former [1989/24] | Polysilazane, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, aus ihnen herstellbare Siliziumnitrid enthaltende keramische Materialien, sowie deren Herstellung | ||
Former [1989/24] | Polysilazanes, their preparation, silicon nitride-containing ceramic articles and their preparation | ||
Former [1989/24] | Polysilazanes, procédé pour leur préparation, matériaux céramiques fabriqués à partir de nitrure de silice et leur fabrication | Examination procedure | 07.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2579418 (CHERONIS NICHOLAS D); | [AD]US4595775 (ARKLES BARRY C [US]); | [A]US4404153 (GAUL JR JOHN H [US]) |