EP0318040 - Process and apparatus for fumigating an enclosed environment with a pesticidal gas mixture and a cartridge for such an apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DETIA FREYBERG GMBH Postfach 11 62 D-69510 Laudenbach / DE | [1989/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schellhaas, Rainer Lindenplatz 16 D-6947 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
Münzel, Martin, Dr. Röderweg 15a D-6140 Bensheim 1 / DE | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119701.6 | 25.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | ZA19870008913 | 27.11.1987 Original published format: ZA 878913 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318040 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318040 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23B9/00, A01M17/00 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
A01M13/003 (EP,US);
A01M17/008 (EP,US);
A23B9/18 (EP,US);
A23B9/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR [1989/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Begasen mit einem Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel und eine dazu geeignete Patrone | [1989/22] | English: | Process and apparatus for fumigating an enclosed environment with a pesticidal gas mixture and a cartridge for such an apparatus | [1989/22] | French: | Procédé et appareil de fumigation utilisant un pesticide gazeux et une cartouche pour un tel appareil | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4200657 (COOK JAMES S [US]); | [A]DE709748 (JOACHIM FREYBERG DR, et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 3, page 568; column 2; ref. no. 24779G, KUSA et al.: "Fumigation of grain products." | by applicant | US4200657 | US4651463 | ZA807479 | ZA864806 | DE3618296 |