EP0318886 - Process for the electrolytic stripping of a protective coating, having a high content of chromium and nickel and/or cobalt, from the substrate of an object made of a superalloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sova, Vladimir Schürmattstrasse 17 CH-5453 Remetschwil / CH | [1989/23] | Application number, filing date | 88119777.6 | 28.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | CH19870004673 | 01.12.1987 Original published format: CH 467387 | [1989/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318886 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318886 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C25F5/00, C23F1/44 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
C25F5/00 (EP,US);
C23F1/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, NL [1989/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum elektrolytischen Ablösen einer einen hohen Cr- und Ni- und/oder Co-Gehalt aufweisenden Oberflächenschutzschicht vom Grundkörper eines aus einer Superlegierung bestehenden Bauteils | [1989/23] | English: | Process for the electrolytic stripping of a protective coating, having a high content of chromium and nickel and/or cobalt, from the substrate of an object made of a superalloy | [1989/23] | French: | Procédé de décapage électrolytique d'une couche protectrice, ayant une haute teneur en chromium et nickel et/ou cobalt, recouvrant un substrat d'un objet fait en superalliage | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3015630 (THOMPSON ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US3819494 (FOUNTAIN L) |