EP0318930 - Voltage controlled oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Micro-Computer Engineering Corporation 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Micro-Computer Engineering Corporation 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Kenji c/o Patent Division KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiya, Ikuo 1-6-4, Daido Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119902.0 | 29.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | JP19870302700 | 30.11.1987 Original published format: JP 30270087 | JP19880161345 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16134588 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318930 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318930 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318930 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/08 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
H03L7/081 (EP,US);
H03L7/00 (KR);
H03L7/0891 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/23] | Title | German: | Spannungsgesteuerter Oszillator | [1989/23] | English: | Voltage controlled oscillator | [1989/23] | French: | Oscillateur commandé en tension | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60080316 ; | [A]JP55055621 ; | [A]EP0046482 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0103404 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US4641048 (POLLOCK IRA G [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 220 (E-341), 6th September 1985; & JP-A-60 080 316 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 11-10-1983, & JP60080316 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 87 (E-016), 6th June 1980; & JP-A-55 055 621 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD) 18-10-1978, & JP55055621 A 00000000 |