EP0326674 - Process for the preparation of 2-ethylhexanol by liquid phase hydrogenation of 2-ethylhexenal and catalyst for this preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lüken, Hans-Gerd, Dr. Droste-Hülshoff-Strasse 123 D-4370 Marl / DE | 02 /
Tanger, Uwe, Dr. Trackener Strasse 2 D-4630 Bochum / DE | 03 /
Droste, Wilhelm, Dr. Pommernstrasse 4 a D-4370 Marl / DE | 04 /
Ludwig, Gerhard, Dr. Holtweg 23 D-4358 Haltern / DE | 05 /
Gubisch, Dietmar, Dr. Distelbeckhof 163 D-4300 Essen 12 / DE | [1989/32] | Application number, filing date | 88120105.7 | 02.12.1988 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | DE19883803464 | 05.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803464 | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326674 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326674 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C31/125, C07C29/17, B01J23/86 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
B01J23/866 (EP,US);
B01J23/86 (EP,US);
C07C29/175 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/175, C07C31/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Ethylhexanol durch Hydrierung von 2-Ethylhexenal in der Flüssigphase und Katalysator zu seiner Herstellung | [1989/32] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2-ethylhexanol by liquid phase hydrogenation of 2-ethylhexenal and catalyst for this preparation | [1989/32] | French: | Procédé de préparation du 2-éthylhexanol par hydrogénation du 2-éthylhexénal en phase liquide et catalyseur pour sa préparation | [1989/32] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 27.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1643856 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [A]US3991127 (CORR HUBERT, et al) |