EP0319044 - V-belt type continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishimaru, Wataru No. 3649-264, Kokubu Ebina City / JP | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/23] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120186.7 | 02.12.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | JP19870305959 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: JP 30595987 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319044 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319044 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/02 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
F16H37/021 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/23] | Title | German: | Stufenlos verstellbares V-Riemengetriebe | [1989/23] | English: | V-belt type continuously variable transmission | [1989/23] | French: | Variateur continu de vitesse à courroie en "V" | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0004487 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]GB2025545 (FIAT RICERCHE); | [A]EP0119935 (RENAULT [FR]); | [AD]JPS60249758 (NISSAN MOTOR) | Examination | EP0179991 |