EP0319868 - Use of carboxymethylsulfoethyl cellulose in drilling fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/24] | Use of cellulose derivatives in drilling fluids | ||
[1993/09] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 15 15 D-29655 Walsrode / DE | [1989/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzog, Dieter, Dr. Hollige 19 D-3030 Walsrode / DE | 02 /
Schriewer, Bernd, Dr. Holunderweg D-3030 Walsrode / DE | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1994/08] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1989/24] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr. BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120201.4 | 03.12.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | DE19873742105 | 11.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3742105 | [1989/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319868 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319868 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319868 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09K7/02 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
C09K8/206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/24] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Carboxymethylsulfoethylcellulose in Bohrspülungen | [1993/09] | English: | Use of carboxymethylsulfoethyl cellulose in drilling fluids | [1993/09] | French: | Utilisation de carboxyméthylsulfoéthyl-cellulose dans les fluids de forage | [1993/09] |
Former [1989/24] | Verwendung von Cellulosederivaten in Bohrspülungen | ||
Former [1989/24] | Use of cellulose derivatives in drilling fluids | ||
Former [1989/24] | Utilisation de dérivés de cellulose dans les fluides de forage | Examination procedure | 03.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1993
17.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Brekelmans, Paul Johan Gérard Akzo N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [1994/20] |
Former [1994/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1993
Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Brekelmans, Paul Johan Gérard Akzo N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 21.01.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.07.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.08.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2811519 (TOUEY GEORGE P); | [Y]US4110226 (SWANSON BILLY L); | [YD]US4519923 (HORI YUJI [JP], et al) |