EP0319880 - Feeding device for pallets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radlmair, Josef Sonnenwiesenstrasse 20 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states Radlmair, Josef Sonnenwiesenstrasse 20 CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Troesch, Hans Alfred, et al Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Troesch, Hans Alfred, Dr. sc. techn., et al Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 88120232.9 | 03.12.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | CH19870004860 | 11.12.1987 Original published format: CH 486087 | CH19880002535 | 04.07.1988 Original published format: CH 253588 | [1989/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319880 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G25/10, B65G1/08 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
B65G25/10 (EP);
B65G1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Palettenvorschubanlage | [1989/24] | English: | Feeding device for pallets | [1989/24] | French: | Dispositif d'avance pour palettes | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/15] | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3658173 ; | [YD]US4212584 ; | [X]DE3006143 ; | [Y]US4600120 ; | [AD]EP0196582 |