EP0320753 - Derivatives of cyclic aminoacids, their preparation, compounds containing them, and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henning, Rainer, Dr. Rotenhofstrasse 31 D-6234 Hattersheim am Main / DE | 02 /
Urbach, Hansjörg, Dr. Le Lavandoustrasse 41 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Hock, Franz, Dr. Altstadt 19 D-6110 Dieburg / DE | [1989/25] | Application number, filing date | 88120325.1 | 06.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | DE19873742431 | 15.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3742431 | [1989/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320753 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320753 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, C07D401/14, C07D401/06, C07D453/06, C07D209/52, C07D209/70, C07D207/16, C07D207/08, C07D295/18, A61K31/40, A61K31/435 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/08 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D209/42 (EP,US);
C07D209/52 (EP,US);
C07D209/54 (EP,US);
C07D209/72 (EP,US);
C07D209/96 (EP,US);
C07D217/26 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Neue Derivate cyclischer Aminosäuren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, sie enthaltende Mittel und deren Verwendung | [1989/25] | English: | Derivatives of cyclic aminoacids, their preparation, compounds containing them, and their use | [1989/25] | French: | Dérivés d'aminoacides cycliques, procédé pour leur préparation, compositions les contenant et leur utilisation | [1989/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 30.12.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0232849 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0286929 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0286928 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0286927 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |