EP0322600 - Gage and method for determining bulge orientation at a bulge joint between a grid sleeve and a guide thimble of a nuclear fuel assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widener, Wade Hampton 1502 Granby Road Cayce, SC 29033 / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Gallo, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. L. Fleuchaus, Dipl.-Phys. H. Schroeter, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lehmann, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehser, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo, Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120351.7 | 06.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870137621 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: US 137621 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322600 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322600 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322600 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/32 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G21C3/332 (EP,US);
G21C3/30 (KR);
G21C3/334 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Lehre und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Wulstrichtung an einer Wulstdrückverbindung zwischen einer Gitterhülse und einem Führungsrohr eines Kernbrennstabbündels | [1989/27] | English: | Gage and method for determining bulge orientation at a bulge joint between a grid sleeve and a guide thimble of a nuclear fuel assembly | [1989/27] | French: | Jauge et méthode pour déterminer l'orientation d'un emboutissage d'un joint fait par emboutissage en une douille d'une grille et un tube-guide d'un assemblage de combustible nucléaire | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 18.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.03.1994 | DE | 16.03.1994 | FR | 16.03.1994 | IT | 16.03.1994 | SE | 16.03.1994 | [2007/52] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 16.03.1994 | |
DE | 16.03.1994 | ||
FR | 16.03.1994 | ||
IT | 16.03.1994 | ||
SE | 16.03.1994 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 16.03.1994 | |
DE | 16.03.1994 | ||
IT | 16.03.1994 | ||
SE | 16.03.1994 | ||
FR | 05.08.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.03.1994 | |
DE | 16.03.1994 | ||
IT | 16.03.1994 | ||
FR | 05.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 16.03.1994 | |
DE | 16.03.1994 | ||
FR | 05.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/07] | DE | 16.03.1994 | |
FR | 05.08.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | DE | 16.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0182149 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]GB1108235 (EURATOM) |