EP0321783 - Preparation method for linseed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stephan, Dieter, Dr. Gehrenwaldstrasse 35A D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Stephan, Günter Happoldstrasse 48 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | [1989/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Kastner, Hermann Patentanwalt Rieslingweg 5 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Kastner, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Ruhrstrasse 10/1 D-71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120437.4 | 07.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873741642 | 09.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741642 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321783 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321783 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321783 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/04, C11B1/10, A23L1/36 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
C11B1/10 (EP);
A23L33/22 (EP);
A61K36/55 (EP);
C11B1/04 (EP);
C11B1/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/26] | C11B1/04, C11B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Aufbereitungsverfahren für Leinsamen | [1989/26] | English: | Preparation method for linseed | [1989/26] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de la graine de lin | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE665873 (HUGO KUEHL DR); | [Y]US4009290 (OKUMORI TOSHIO, et al) | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, Band 27, Nr. 3, März 1950, Seiten 93-96, Champaign, IL, US; H.B. COATS et al.: "Solvent extraction. III. The effect of particle size on extraction rate" | [A] - D. SWERN: "Bailey's industrial oil and fat products", Auflage 4, Band 2, 1982, Seiten 182-187, Wiley & Sons, New York, US |