EP0319951 - Antistatic photographic recording materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DU PONT DE NEMOURS (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH Du Pont Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states DU PONT DE NEMOURS (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH Du Pont Strasse 1 D-61352 Bad Homburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesse, Konrad, Dr. Marienbader Strasse 8B D-6365 Rosbach 3 / DE | 02 /
Oezelsel, Mehmet Oezbay, Dr. Hans-Sachs-Weg 14 D-6783 Obernburg / DE | [1989/24] | Application number, filing date | 88120443.2 | 07.12.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | DE19873741355 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741355 | [1989/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319951 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/82 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
G03C1/85 (EP);
G03C1/895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Antistatische photographische Aufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1989/24] | English: | Antistatic photographic recording materials | [1989/24] | French: | Matériaux d'enregistrement photographique antistatiques | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/31] | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0170529 ; | [A]DE3124984 ; | [X]JPS62109044 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 324 (P-628)[2771]22. Oktober 1987; & JP-A-62 109 044 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD) 20-05-1987 |