EP0324109 - 6-substituted mitomycin analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/29] | New 6-substituted mitomycin analogs | ||
[1993/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY PATENTS, INC. 1465 Post Road East, P.O. Box 901 Westport Connecticut 06881 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY PATENTS, INC. 1465 Post Road East, P.O. Box 901 Westport, Connecticut 06881 / US | ||
Former [1989/29] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY PATENTS, INC. P.O. Box 915 Westport, CT 06881 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remers, William A. 5022 East Calle Guebabi Tucson, Arizona 85718 / US | 02 /
Sami, Salah M. 827 East Alturas Tucson, Arizona 85718 / US | [1993/39] |
Former [1989/29] | 01 /
Remers, William A. 5022 East Calle Guebabi Tucson Arizona 85718 / US | ||
02 /
Sami, Salah M. 827 East Alturas Tucson Arizona 85718 / US | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120533.0 | 08.12.1988 | [1989/29] | Priority number, date | US19870135317 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: US 135317 | [1989/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0324109 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0324109 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324109 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/14, C07F7/18, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/14, 209:00, 209:00, 203:00) | [1989/29] | CPC: |
C07D487/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/29] | Title | German: | 6-Substituierte Mitomycinanaloge | [1989/29] | English: | 6-substituted mitomycin analogs | [1993/39] | French: | Analogues de la mitomycine substitués en 6 | [1989/29] |
Former [1989/29] | New 6-substituted mitomycin analogs | Examination procedure | 07.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 07.05.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.1993 | BE | 29.09.1993 | ES | 29.09.1993 | GR | 29.09.1993 | IT | 29.09.1993 | NL | 29.09.1993 | SE | 29.09.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
BE | 29.09.1993 | ||
GR | 29.09.1993 | ||
IT | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
BE | 29.09.1993 | ||
IT | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
BE | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
BE | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 29.09.1993 | |
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 29.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3531197 (UNIVERSITY PATENTS INC [US]); | [XP]GB2196006 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) | [XD] - THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, vol. 33, 1980 C.URAKAWA et al. "Synthesis and biological activities of 7-alkoxymitosanes." pages 804-809 | Examination | - THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, vol. 33, August 1980, pages 804-809; C. URAKAWA et al.: "Synthesis and biological activities of 7-alkoxymitosanes" |