EP0320808 - Plastic closure for open containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jacob Berg GmbH & Co. KG D-55257 Budenheim / DE | [1989/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120571.0 | 09.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | DE19873742649 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3742649 | [1989/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0320808 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D45/32 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
B65D45/32 (EP);
B65D47/063 (EP);
B65D47/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/25] | Title | German: | Kunststoffverschluss für offene Behälter | [1989/25] | English: | Plastic closure for open containers | [1989/25] | French: | Fermeture en matière plastique pour récipients ouverts | [1989/25] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/31] | 13.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0216268 ; | [Y]GB2085854 |