EP0330748 - Cupboard or sideboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAN-BRASILIA WERK GMBH Industriestrasse 13 D-68601 Lampertheim / DE | [1989/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Dieter Ausserhalb Nr. 7 D-6843 Biblis / DE | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rubensstraße 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120586.8 | 09.12.1988 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | DE19883804660 | 15.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3804660 | [1989/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330748 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330748 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330748 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47B47/05, A47B96/14 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
A47B96/1475 (EP);
A47B47/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Schrank oder Schrankwand | [1989/36] | English: | Cupboard or sideboard | [1989/36] | French: | Armoire ou armoire muzale | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   09.02.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.08.1993 | GR | 11.08.1993 | IT | 11.08.1993 | SE | 11.08.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 11.08.1993 | |
GR | 11.08.1993 | ||
IT | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | GR | 11.08.1993 | |
IT | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.08.1993 | |
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 11.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1429611 (LUST KG ERNST); | [A]US3736035 (BROWN M T, et al) |