EP0373230 - Process for the microbiological preparation of 1,3-propane-diol from glycerol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/23] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gottschalk, G., Prof. Dr. Johann-Wolf-Strasse 35a D-3412 Nörtenhardenberg / DE | 02 /
Averhoff, Beate, Dipl.-Biol. Osterlandweg 13 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Hartong, Richard Leroy, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Hartong, Richard Leroy, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1990/25] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120718.7 | 12.12.1988 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0373230 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373230 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/18 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur mikrobiologischen Herstellung von 1,3-Propandiol aus Glycerin | [1990/25] | English: | Process for the microbiological preparation of 1,3-propane-diol from glycerol | [1990/25] | French: | Procédé de préparation microbiologique de 1,3-propanediol à partir de glycérol | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3336051 (MAIZENA GMBH [DE]) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 25, 22nd June 1987, page 537, abstract no. 212512a, Columbus, Ohio, US; C.W. FORSBERG: "Production of 1,3-propanediol from glycerol by Clostridium acetobutylicum and other Clostridium species", & APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL. 1987, 53(4), 639-43 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, 1984, page 340, abstract no. 166873r, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. SCHUETZ et al.: "Anaerobic reduction of glycerol to 1,3-propanediol by Lactobacillus brevis and Lactobacillus buchneri", & SYST. APPL. MCIROBIOL. 1984, 5(2), 169-78 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 7, 17th August 1987, page 333, abstract no. 54605x, Columbus, Ohio, US; E.A. JOHNSON et al.: "Klebsiella pneumoniae 1,3-propanediol:NAD oxidoreductase", & J. BACTERIOL. 1987, 169(5), 2050-4 |