EP0320851 - Condensation preventing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamasaki, Hidenori c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Sanda Seisakusho, 3-33 Miwa 2-chome Sanda-shi Hyogo-669-13 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Katsuaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Sanda Seisakusho, 3-33 Miwa 2-chome Sanda-shi Hyogo 669-13 / JP | 03 /
Osuga, Yoshiharu c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Denshi Shohin Kaihatsu Kenkyusho, 1, Babazusho Nagaokakyo-shi Hyogo 617 / JP | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120740.1 | 12.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | JP19870317832 | 14.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31783287 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320851 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320851 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320851 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/14, G11B15/61 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
G11B33/1453 (EP);
G11B33/14 (KR);
G11B15/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Kondensations-Verhinderungsgerät | [1989/25] | English: | Condensation preventing apparatus | [1989/25] | French: | Appareil empêchant la condensation | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP63000843 ; | [X]JP59193562 ; | [A]JP58128038 ; | [A]JP58164049 ; | [A]JP58073032 ; | [A]DE1959327 (FERNSEH GMBH); | [A]GB1507568 (SONY CORP); | [A]US3860959 (KUDOU YOKU) | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 12, No. 199 (P-714)(3046) 09 June 1988,& JP-A-63 000 843 (CLARION CO.) 05 January 1988,, & JP63000843 A 19880105 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 9, No. 58 (P-341)(1781) 14 March 1985,& JP-A-59 193 562 (SONY) 02 November 1984,, & JP59193562 A 19841102 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 7, No. 241 (P-232)(1386) 26 October 1983,& JP-A-58 128 038 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) 30 July 1983,, & JP58128038 A 19830730 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 7, No. 290 (P-245)(1435) 24 December 1983,& JP-A-58 164 049 (SANYO DENKI) 28 September 1983,, & JP58164049 A 19830928 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 7, No. 168 (P-212)(1313) 23 July 1983,& JP-A-58 073 032 (CANON) 02 May 1983,, & JP58073032 A 19830502 | Examination | EP0200536 |