EP0322626 - Power grinder with an adjustable protecting hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. & E. FEIN GmbH & Co. Leuschnerstrasse 41-47 D-70176 Stuttgart / DE | [1989/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1989/27] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120765.8 | 13.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | DE19873744219 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3744219 | [1989/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322626 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322626 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322626 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0322626 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B24B55/05 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
B24B55/052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/13] |
Former [1989/27] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Handschleifmaschine mit verstellbarer Schutzhaube | [1989/27] | English: | Power grinder with an adjustable protecting hood | [1989/27] | French: | Meuleuse portative avec capot de protection orientable | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/49] | 18.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/52] | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.1993
12.01.1994
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1994/07] | 08.02.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05) | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.01.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.02.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.07.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0143251 (FEIN C & E); | [Y]US3811233 (EBY C); | [A]FR2213651 (CINCINNATI MILACRON INC [US]) |