EP0321837 - Data pattern synchronizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Mishio c/o Advantest Corporation 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
Former [1989/26] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120841.7 | 13.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | JP19870324831 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32483187 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321837 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321837 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321837 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/04, H04J3/06, H04J3/14 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
H04L7/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/26] | H04L7/04, H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/26] | Title | German: | Datenmustersynchronisiereinrichtung | [1989/26] | English: | Data pattern synchronizer | [1989/26] | French: | Synchronisateur de structures de données | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3648237 (FREY ALEXANDER H JR, et al); | [A]DE2735203 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0101056 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4590601 (BEEMAN ROBERT H [US]) |