EP0363526 - Window-washing arrangement actuating process for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1990/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Dieter Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 74 D-6365 Rosbach / DE | 02 /
Allerdist, Heinz Feldbergstrasse 2 D-6380 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Klein, Thomas Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120845.8 | 14.12.1988 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | DE19883833579 | 03.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3833579 | [1990/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363526 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363526 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0363526 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/02 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
B60S1/485 (EP);
B60S1/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1990/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Scheibenwaschanlage für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1990/16] | English: | Window-washing arrangement actuating process for a motor vehicle | [1990/16] | French: | Procédé pour faire fonctionner un ensemble de lavage de vitres pour véhicules automobiles | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3638336 (ZEISER MANFRED P [DE]); | [A]DE3047396 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]FR2442747 (MOLIA LOUIS) |