EP0320969 - Oscillation circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakihama, Kazuhisa Patent Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Takuya Patent Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Sueda, Akihiro Patent Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121112.2 | 16.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | JP19870320424 | 18.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32042487 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320969 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320969 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320969 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/03 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
H03K3/014 (EP,US);
H03B5/36 (KR);
H03K3/0307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/25] | Title | German: | Schwingungsschaltung | [1989/25] | English: | Oscillation circuit | [1989/25] | French: | Circuit d'oscillation | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/25] | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4282496 (HEUNER ROBERT C); | [A]US4328571 (NOBLE ROBERT T); | [A]US4613829 (OTT RUSSELL G [US]); | [A]US4704587 (OUYANG KENNETH W [US], et al) |