EP0321953 - A charge transfer device provided with an improved output stage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Hiroaki c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Miwada, Kazuo c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121402.7 | 21.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | JP19870326178 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32617887 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321953 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321953 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321953 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, G11C19/00 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
H01L29/76816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/26] | Title | German: | Ladungsübertragungsanordnung mit einer verbesserten Ausgangsstufe | [1989/26] | English: | A charge transfer device provided with an improved output stage | [1989/26] | French: | Dispositif à transfert de charge ayant un étage de sortie amélioré | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0096166 (IBM [US]); | [X]GB2116398 (RCA CORP); | [X]EP0192142 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |