Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.03.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] |
11.12.1996 | Application refused | |
29.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
10.01.1996 | Renewal fee | |
29.06.1992 | First examination report | |
08.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
23.10.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] |
27.05.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] |